02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Held under submission. | |||
05/25/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/24/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/23/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 16). | |||
04/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/10/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | |||
02/09/2011 | Read first time. To print. |