02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/25/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/16/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/10/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | |||
02/09/2011 | Read first time. To print. |