|
01/26/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 3198.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2392.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2426.).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 1729.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|