|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2379.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1850.).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1038.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|