|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 543, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2126.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Emmerson.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 979.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|