LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB31
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB31
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB31
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/26/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/25/2011
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
03/24/2011
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
02/10/2011
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
12/07/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
12/06/2010
Read first time. To print.