|
08/05/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1852.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1385.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|