California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB318 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012