|
06/13/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 26, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1136.).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 812.).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|