02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
06/27/2011 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/14/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/12/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
05/11/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |||
05/02/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
02/11/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |||
02/10/2011 | Read first time. To print. |