|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 544, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3071.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2352.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 1718.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|