|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 2490.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1962.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 982.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|