|
07/05/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 1391.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|