|
06/30/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 3. Page 1699.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|