|
09/10/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 18. Page 2488.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 18. Page 2424.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Padilla. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2424.)
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 22).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 31. Page 1649.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|