08/27/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |||
08/24/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
08/23/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/22/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |||
07/02/2012 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wright. | |||
06/27/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1454.) | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
02/11/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |||
02/10/2011 | Read first time. To print. |