LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB353
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB353
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB353
Compare Versions
AB353 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB353 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB353 Amended August 22, 2011
AB353 Amended June 16, 2011
AB353 Introduced February 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB353 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB353 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB353 Amended August 22, 2011
AB353 Amended June 16, 2011
AB353 Introduced February 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare