07/01/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 55, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/29/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/21/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:40 a.m. | |||
06/13/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/10/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1377.). | |||
06/08/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/07/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 7). | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/25/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
03/25/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 702.) | |||
03/21/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
03/17/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 15). | |||
02/11/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |||
02/10/2011 | Read first time. To print. |