02/01/2012 | Died on inactive file. | |||
01/09/2012 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Hill. | |||
01/05/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/04/2012 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
05/16/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/26/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/22/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and L. GOV. | |||
02/11/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |||
02/10/2011 | Read first time. To print. |