California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 7, 2011
Bill June 21, 2011
Bill April 28, 2011
Bill April 13, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011