|
08/28/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Brownley.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to the unfinished business file.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1855.).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 1456.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|