California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill July 12, 2011
Bill May 19, 2011
Bill May 11, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011