California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill May 9, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011