|
07/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 56, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:55 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 1473.).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1446.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|