|
08/05/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1786.).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1177.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|