|
07/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5599.).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4224.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3606.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|