LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB37
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB37
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB37
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
05/09/2011
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/04/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
01/24/2011
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
12/07/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
12/06/2010
Read first time. To print.