LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB377
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB377
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB377
Compare Versions
AB377 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB377 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB377 Amended August 24, 2012
AB377 Amended August 6, 2012
AB377 Amended April 14, 2011
AB377 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB377 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB377 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB377 Amended August 24, 2012
AB377 Amended August 6, 2012
AB377 Amended April 14, 2011
AB377 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare