|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1650.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|