LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB384
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB384
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB384
Compare Versions
AB384 Chaptered August 4, 2011
AB384 Enrolled July 15, 2011
AB384 Amended June 28, 2011
AB384 Amended April 5, 2011
AB384 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB384 Chaptered August 4, 2011
AB384 Enrolled July 15, 2011
AB384 Amended June 28, 2011
AB384 Amended April 5, 2011
AB384 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare