02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/18/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/12/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/11/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 3). | |||
04/28/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/15/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |||
02/14/2011 | Read first time. To print. |