California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill June 21, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011
Bill March 25, 2011