|
09/06/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2375.).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1786.).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1042.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|