02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/04/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
05/04/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/17/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
03/16/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
02/15/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |||
02/14/2011 | Read first time. To print. |