02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | |||
02/15/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |||
02/14/2011 | Read first time. To print. |