|
08/31/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(15) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 5032.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 5032.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 4945.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Ordered to the Senate. Action rescinded whereby the bill was ordered to the Senate. Ordered to the unfinished business file. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2187.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1560.)
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|