02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/11/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
04/07/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. | |||
02/15/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |||
02/14/2011 | Read first time. To print. |