LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB408
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB408
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB408
Compare Versions
AB408 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB408 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB408 Amended August 29, 2011
AB408 Amended August 22, 2011
AB408 Amended July 13, 2011
AB408 Amended April 12, 2011
AB408 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB408 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB408 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB408 Amended August 29, 2011
AB408 Amended August 22, 2011
AB408 Amended July 13, 2011
AB408 Amended April 12, 2011
AB408 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare