LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB413
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB413
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB413
Compare Versions
AB413 Chaptered August 8, 2011
AB413 Enrolled July 15, 2011
AB413 Amended May 24, 2011
AB413 Amended April 5, 2011
AB413 Amended March 23, 2011
AB413 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB413 Chaptered August 8, 2011
AB413 Enrolled July 15, 2011
AB413 Amended May 24, 2011
AB413 Amended April 5, 2011
AB413 Amended March 23, 2011
AB413 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare