LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB426
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB426
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB426
Compare Versions
AB426 Chaptered July 25, 2011
AB426 Enrolled July 8, 2011
AB426 Amended June 10, 2011
AB426 Amended May 16, 2011
AB426 Amended March 31, 2011
AB426 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB426 Chaptered July 25, 2011
AB426 Enrolled July 8, 2011
AB426 Amended June 10, 2011
AB426 Amended May 16, 2011
AB426 Amended March 31, 2011
AB426 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare