|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 2482.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1848.).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 7).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 1230.)
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|