|
08/31/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 195, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1915.).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 910.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|