LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB440
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB440
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB440
Compare Versions
AB440 Amended August 24, 2012
AB440 Amended August 30, 2011
AB440 Amended July 12, 2011
AB440 Amended June 29, 2011
AB440 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB440 Amended August 24, 2012
AB440 Amended August 30, 2011
AB440 Amended July 12, 2011
AB440 Amended June 29, 2011
AB440 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare