|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 365, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6248.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4690.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 3603.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|