02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/11/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/10/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |||
04/26/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Read first time. To print. |