02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/09/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
09/09/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
09/08/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/16/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Read first time. To print. |