|
10/08/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2833.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2125.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1712.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|