|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1589.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|