07/25/2011 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
07/11/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. | |||
07/05/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/05/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1712.). | |||
05/11/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (May 9). | |||
04/25/2011 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
04/07/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/07/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 876.) | |||
03/31/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
03/30/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Read first time. To print. |