|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 1842.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1843.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 1460.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|